HOLY TRINITY SCHOOL PARENT-TEACHER ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The object of the Association is to advance the education in the school by providing and assisting in the provision of facilities not within the scope of the budget from the LEA. In addition, to foster more extended relationships within the school's community and engage in activities which support the school and advance the education of the pupils attending.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Windsor And Maidenhead
Governance
- 09 June 1980: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kate Joanne Winrow-Davies | Chair | 01 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
James Andrew Lowe | Trustee | 01 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Gemma Ransome | Trustee | 01 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Brittain | Trustee | 01 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sally Macmillan | Trustee | 01 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Robert Parker | Trustee | 01 November 2018 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £43.48k | £25.55k | £3.78k | £14.43k | £31.04k | |
|
Total expenditure | £72.54k | £11.63k | £35.13k | £13.24k | £19.88k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 25 April 2025 | 299 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 25 April 2025 | 299 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 09 May 2024 | 314 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 30 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 02 May 2022 | 306 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 02 May 2022 | 306 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 30 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 30 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 12TH DECEMBER 1979
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS OF THE SCHOOL BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES NOT PROVIDED BY THE LOCAL EDUCATION AUTORITY.
Area of benefit
COOKHAM-ON-THAMES
Contact information
- Address:
-
Holy Trinity Primary School
School Lane
Cookham
Maidenhead
SL6 9QJ
- Phone:
- 01628523766
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window