THE POTHOHAR ASSOCIATION U.K.

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The principle objective of the Association is the cultural and religous welfare and advancement of the Pothohar and associated community in the U.K.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

11 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England
Governance
- 18 June 1980: Standard registration
- THE PUTHOHAR ASSOCIATION U.K. (Previous name)
- THE PUTHOHAR COMMUNITY (UK ) (Previous name)
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
dr Harpreet Peter Singh Chadha | Trustee | 29 October 2023 |
|
|||||
Davinder Jolly | Trustee | 29 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Tanu Banaik | Trustee | 29 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Belinder Kahai | Trustee | 29 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Indpreet Ekta Kaur Ross | Trustee | 29 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Avneet Sethi | Trustee | 29 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Satyadeep Singh Gujral | Trustee | 19 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jatinder Kaur | Trustee | 01 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Meharban Singh Mehta | Trustee | 12 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Raminder Singh Chowdhary | Trustee | 12 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
BHUPINDER SINGH BHASIN | Trustee | 12 May 2019 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.06k | £56.18k | £39.80k | £2.61k | £17.63k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.73k | £5.69k | £50.67k | £49.08k | £10.51k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £2.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 03 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 21 June 2024 | 52 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 22 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 22 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 28 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 28 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 28 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 28/04/1990 AS AMENDED ON 02/03/1985 AS AMENDED ON 16/10/1999 AS AMENDED ON 17/10/2004 AS AMENDED ON 04/10/2015 as amended on 05 Feb 2023
Charitable objects
(A) TO ADVANCE AND PROMOTE UNIVERSAL BROTHERHOOD OF MANKIND AS BEING THE FUNDAMENTAL PART OF THE SIKH RELIGION. (B) TO SEEK TO HELP THE AGED AS CONSIDERED APPROPRIATE BY THE EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE AND TO PROMOTE THEIR CAUSES IN THE ASSOCIATION AND THE COMMUNITY.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
60 GAYTON ROAD
HARROW
HA1 2LS
- Phone:
- 07931514145
- Email:
- gen.sec@thepothohar.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window