Governing document THE POTHOHAR ASSOCIATION U.K.
Charity number: 280065

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 28/04/1990 AS AMENDED ON 02/03/1985 AS AMENDED ON 16/10/1999 AS AMENDED ON 17/10/2004 AS AMENDED ON 04/10/2015 as amended on 05 Feb 2023
Charitable objects
(A) TO ADVANCE AND PROMOTE UNIVERSAL BROTHERHOOD OF MANKIND AS BEING THE FUNDAMENTAL PART OF THE SIKH RELIGION. (B) TO SEEK TO HELP THE AGED AS CONSIDERED APPROPRIATE BY THE EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE AND TO PROMOTE THEIR CAUSES IN THE ASSOCIATION AND THE COMMUNITY.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
NOT DEFINED
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.