HAWKINGE VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
All the activities as below
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024
People

15 Trustee(s)
14 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Kent
Governance
- 27 June 1980: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ELIZABETH BROADY | Chair | 09 December 2011 |
|
|
||||
Michelle Ede | Trustee | 29 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Louise McGettrick | Trustee | 29 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Barry Arnold | Trustee | 25 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Tereasa Johnson | Trustee | 06 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Zoe Cutting | Trustee | 06 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Adam Denton | Trustee | 06 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Robyn Anne Powney | Trustee | 19 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Roy William Adams | Trustee | 19 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
TONY HUTT | Trustee | 29 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
Tina Jane Harris | Trustee | 06 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Miller | Trustee | 25 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Diana Elliott | Trustee | 01 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
CAROLE SEABROOK | Trustee | 09 December 2011 |
|
|
||||
Anthony de Ste Croix | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 29/02/2020 | 28/02/2021 | 28/02/2022 | 28/02/2023 | 29/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £17.19k | £2.11k | £16.30k | £16.30k | £16.74k | |
|
Total expenditure | £24.17k | £8.09k | £11.88k | £13.59k | £11.88k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | 25 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | 25 January 2024 | 28 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | 11 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | 24 February 2022 | 58 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 29 February 2020 | 21 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONVEYANCE DATED 9TH APRIL 1980
Charitable objects
A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF HAWKINGE AND ITS IMMEDIATE VICINITY IN THE COUNTY OF KENT WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS INCLUDING USE FOR MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES OR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
THE PARISH OF HAWKINGE AND ITS IMMEDIATE VICINITY
Contact information
- Address:
-
83 Shorncliffe Crescent
Folkestone
CT20 3PG
- Phone:
- 07795165957
- Email:
- lizbroady@hotmail.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window