STANTON DREW LECTURE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provide and maintain a venue where social activities can be held for the local community, preschool, art classes, keep fit, weddings birthday parties etc. and fund raising events for the school, church etc.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Bath And North East Somerset
Governance
- 21 May 1980: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Richard Keel | Trustee | 14 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lorraine Penney | Trustee | 16 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
CHARLES ROBERT FARMER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £19.77k | £26.53k | £36.28k | £15.63k | £19.28k | |
|
Total expenditure | £17.79k | £20.47k | £12.91k | £14.14k | £16.88k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | £18.64k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 28 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 20 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 04 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 04 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 18 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 18 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 04 November 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
INDENTURE DATED 7TH FEBRUARY 1920
Charitable objects
TO BE USED AND ENJOYED BY THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF STANTON DREW FOR HOLDING MEETINGS, LECTURES, READINGS, CONCERTS AND FOR ANY OTHER OBJECTS OF AN EDUCATIONAL OR RECREATIVE CHARACTER.
Area of benefit
THE PARISH OF STANTON DREW
Contact information
- Address:
-
Fair View
Stanton Drew
BRISTOL
BS39 4EJ
- Phone:
- 01275332576
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window