WESSEX CANCER TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
WESSEX CANCER TRUST supports people with cancer and their families in Hampshire, Wiltshire, Dorset, Isle of Wight, Channel Islands and beyond. It runs cancer support centres that offer free counselling and complementary therapies, as well as practical support. The charity promotes cancer awareness and detection through education and campaigns.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2017
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Dorset
- Hampshire
- Isle Of Wight
- Wiltshire
Governance
- 29 May 1980: Standard registration
- 08 May 2019: Removed (Amalgamated)
- 08 May 2019: Funds transferred to 1110216 Wessex Cancer Support
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2013 | 31/12/2014 | 31/12/2015 | 31/12/2016 | 31/12/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £16.27k | £113 | £0 | £16.74k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £16.27k | £113 | £0 | £16.74k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2017 | 23 May 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2017 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2016 | 29 September 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2016 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2015 | 14 June 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2015 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 3RD MARCH 1980
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE PERSONS SUFFERING FROM CANCER, TO PROMOTE RESEARCH INTO AND TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE NATURE, CAUSES, PREVENTION AND TREATMENT OF CANCER BY SUCH MEANS AS ARE CHARITABLE.
Area of benefit
WESSEX
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window