SAYAGYI U BA KHIN MEMORIAL TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provides facilities for the study and practice of Theravada Buddhism and Buddhist meditation in the tradition of Sayagyi U Ba Khin and Mother Sayamagyi
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

19 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Wiltshire
Governance
- 05 June 1980: Standard registration
- SAYAGYI U BA KHIN MEMORIAL TRUST (Working name)
- SAYAJI U BA KHIN MEMORIAL TRUST (Previous name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
19 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Roger Stanz Newton | Trustee | 11 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
OLIVER WATERHOUSE | Trustee | 07 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Amitabh Dwivedi | Trustee | 04 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
SIMON JUGHARD | Trustee | 30 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
KYAW KYAW CHITTIN | Trustee | 30 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
DR WILLIAM PRUITT | Trustee | 12 March 2001 |
|
|
||||
Dr CHRISTIAN KARL ERNST WUNSCHIK | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JOSEPH ALOISIUS JOOSTEN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
NICOLA SALLY NEWTON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PROF KEDAR NATH DWIVEDI | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ARABELLA LILIAN VIRGINIA DELAHUNTY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
VIRGINIA CUNYNGHAME JUDKINS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ROY MILLMAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
FRANZ CHRISTOF NEUNER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DAVID FORBES BORRIE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
NEIL PAVITT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
KAYE FRANCES HULENA | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
KEVIN GERALD DELAHUNTY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
THERES DORA KELLER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £373.48k | £308.55k | £399.83k | £634.87k | £499.65k | |
|
Total expenditure | £305.65k | £240.28k | £503.95k | £459.72k | £528.94k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | £512.10k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £117.42k | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | N/A | £4.53k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | £816 | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £459.72k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | N/A | £4.04k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 19 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 19 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 19 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 19 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 18 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 18 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 13 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 13 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 30 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 30 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 18 MAR 1980 AS AMENDED ON 19 NOV 2017 as amended on 13 Oct 2022 as amended on 14 Oct 2022
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THERAVADA BUDDHIST RELIGION THROUGH PROMOTING IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE PRINCIPLES ESTABLISHED BY THE LATE SAYAJI U BA KHIN THE STUDY AND PRACTICE OF THE TECHNIQUES OF DEVELOPING CONCENTRATION INSIGHT AND HIGHER STANDARDS OF MORALITY AS ORIGINALLY TAUGHT BY THE BUDDHA THROUGH THE PUBLIC DISSEMINATION GENERALLY OF THE TEACHINGS OF BUDDHA.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
SAYAGYI U BA KHIN MEMORIAL TRUST
SPLATTS HOUSE
THE SPLATTS
HEDDINGTON
CALNE
SN11 0PE
- Phone:
- 01380850238
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window