THE CITY OF PORTSMOUTH AND DISTRICT ORGANISTS' ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The objects of the Association are to advance the education of the public in the study of the art of music with special reference to liturgical and organ music.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Portsmouth City
Governance
- 29 May 1980: Standard registration
- PDOA (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PHILIP DREW BA, ARCO | Chair |
|
||||||
Hugh Darnley Smith BA | Trustee | 11 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Dixon | Trustee | 08 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Anthony Froggatt MusB, ARCO | Trustee | 18 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr DAVID JOHN CHANDLER PRICE GMus, FGCM | Trustee | 18 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Canon Peter David Gould FRCO | Trustee | 06 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
DAVID PAUL CAIN MA, ARCO | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
LYNDON FORD | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.03k | £565 | £463 | £439 | £431 | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.03k | £400 | £222 | £591 | £296 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 05 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 25 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 03 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 04 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 25 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 27TH OCTOBER 1979
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE STUDY OF THE ART OF MUSIC WITH SPECIAL REFERENCE TO LITURGICAL AND ORGAN MUSIC.
Area of benefit
CITY OF PORTSMOUTH AND DISTRICT
Contact information
- Address:
-
St. Georges Church
St. Georges Walk
WATERLOOVILLE
Hampshire
PO7 7EH
- Phone:
- 07881416979
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window