Accounts and annual returns CAMPION SCHOOL PARENTS' ASSOCIATION

Charity Number: 280173
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 18 December 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 18 December 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2022 20 April 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 20 April 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 23 March 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 23 March 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 11 February 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 11 February 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2019 18 June 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 18 June 2020 On Time Download Open in new window