THE RABBI NACHMAN OF BRESLOV CHARITABLE FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Promoting the advancement of the religion of the orthodox Jewish faith and education in the said faith.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

2 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Israel
Governance
- 19 June 1980: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ben Moss-Barclay | Chair | 05 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
HYMAN DAVIES | Trustee | 29 December 2024 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £39.53k | £31.88k | £16.18k | £22.48k | £37.38k | |
|
Total expenditure | £47.01k | £31.81k | £13.12k | £24.44k | £38.43k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 31 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 31 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 02 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 24 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 15 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 15 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 29 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 29 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 30TH APRIL 1980
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE RELIGION OF THE ORTHODOX JEWISH FAITH AND EDUCATION IN THE SAID FAITH INCLUDING BUT WITHOUB PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF SYNAGOGOUES AND THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR ANY PERSON OR PERSONS FOR THE STUDY OF AND INSTRUCTION IN ORTHODOX JEWISH RELIGIOUS LITERATURE INCLUDING IN PARTICULAR THE WORK OF RABBI NACHAM OF BRESLOV AND HIS FOLLOWERS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
8 HEREFORD DRIVE
PRESTWICH
MANCHESTER
M25 0JA
- Phone:
- 0161 837 6802
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window