Governing document The Society for Cardiac Science and Technology LTD

Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 30TH NOVEMBER 1965 AND AMENDED 2ND NOVEMBER 1979 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 15TH NOVEMBER 1991 AND AMENDED 8 AUGUST 1996 BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 11 AUG 2008 as amended on 24 Nov 2023
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS FOR WHICH THE SOCIETY IS ESTABLISHED ARE: (A) TO ADVANCE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT THE SCIENCE AND PRACTICE OF CARDIOLOGICAL SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY AND ALLIED SUBJECTS BY THE PROMOTION OF IMPROVED STANDARDS OF EDUCATION AND TRAINING AND OF RESEARCH WORK THEREIN AND BY MAKING THE RESULTS OF SUCH STUDY AND RESEARCH AVAILABLE TO PRACTITIONERS AND THE GENERAL PUBLIC. (B) TO PROVIDE FOR THE DELIVERY OF LECTURES, THE HOLDING OF CLASSES AND EXAMINATIONS, THE ESTABLISHMENT OF SCHOLARSHIPS AND THE GRANTING OR PRIZES, DIPLOMAS AND CERTIFICATES OF MERIT AND EFFICIENCY IN CONNECTION WITH THE SCIENCE AND PRACTICE OF CARDIOLOGICAL SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY AND ALLIED SUBJECTS (C) TO MAKE AND MAINTAIN LISTS OF PERSONS WHOM THE COUNCIL OF THE SOCIETY SHALL CONSIDER TO BE QUALIFIED TO PRACTICE CARDIOLOGICAL SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY AND ALLIED SUBJECTS AND TO TAKE MEASURES AGAINST ANY UNQUALIFIED PERSON CLAIMING TO POSSESS OR HOLDING HIMSELF OR HERSELF OUT AS POSSESSING A CERTIFICATE OR DIPLOMA OF THE SOCIETY (D) TO PROMOTE, ORGANISE AND CONDUCT CONFERENCES, PUBLIC MEETINGS AND EXHIBITIONS OF APPARATUS, PLANT AND PROCESSES IN CONNECTION WITH THE SCIENCE AND PRACTICE OF CARDIOLOGICAL SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY AND ALLIED SUBJECTS (E) TO PUBLISH A JOURNAL AND SUCH OTHER PAPERS, TREATISES, WORKS AND COMMUNICATION AS THE SOCIETY MAY THINK NECESSARY OR DESIRABLE TO PROMOTE THE OBJECTS OF THE SOCIETY.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.