Trustees The Society for Cardiac Science and Technology LTD
Charity number: 280183

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jamie Walton | Trustee | 22 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Gareth Clifford | Trustee | 22 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Katie Sanders | Trustee | 22 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Suzanne Louise Ramsay | Trustee | 05 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Gavin Colin John McClean | Trustee | 05 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
James Malcolmson | Trustee | 05 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Vitor Miguel Felix Morgado | Trustee | 30 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Christopher James Cox | Trustee | 30 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Duncan Roger Sleeman | Trustee | 30 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Heather Herbert | Trustee | 30 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Nolan Stain-Montalvo | Trustee | 30 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Susan Elizabeth Baxter | Trustee | 14 March 2013 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.