Accounts and annual returns GHANA UNION LONDON

Charity number: 280273
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2010 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2010 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2009 08 June 2010 128 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2009 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2008 12 February 2009 12 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2008 12 June 2009 132 days late
Annual return 31 March 2007 19 February 2008 19 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2007 20 February 2008 20 days late
Annual return 31 March 2006 29 January 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2006 29 January 2007 On Time