Financial history THE EMMANUEL KAYE FOUNDATION

Charity number: 280281
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £970.29k £543.55k £489.89k £388.98k £490.12k
Total expenditure £755.22k £649.85k £715.84k £533.87k £632.35k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £940.24k £508.25k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Endowments £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Investment £30.05k £35.30k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Legacies £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £730.16k £649.85k N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds £25.06k £0 N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance £6.16k £43.85k N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £724.00k £606.00k N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £25.06k £0 N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A