GALLEYWOOD WOMEN'S INSTITUTE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our organisation endeavours to offer opportunities to the women of the parish and surrounding area, for them to learn and develop new skills and widen their horizons. We also seek to influence local and national affairs.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charitable Activities
- Essex
Governance
- 04 June 1980: Standard registration
No other names
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Pauline Horemans | Chair | 12 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Wendy Lynne Johnson | Trustee | 03 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Elaine Grant | Trustee | 03 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Anna Vera Nokes | Trustee | 03 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Valerie Allen | Trustee | 02 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Susan Doreen Jeffery | Trustee | 02 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTINE ELIZABETH PAUL | Trustee | 04 January 2018 |
|
|||||
SHIRLEY CLARK | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SUSAN WAREING | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.81k | £2.96k | £1.28k | £2.76k | £3.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.66k | £2.15k | £1.98k | £2.66k | £3.30k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 27 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 19 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 29 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 31 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MODEL CONSTITUTION AND RULES (ALREADY LODGED)
Charitable objects
TO IMPROVE AND DEVELOP CONDITIONS OF RURAL LIFE IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE CONSTITUTION AND RULES OF THE WOMEN'S INSTITUTE.
Area of benefit
GALLEYWOOD CHELMSFORD
Contact information
- Address:
-
18 LYON CLOSE
CHELMSFORD
CM2 8NY
- Phone:
- 01245258755
- Email:
- fedsec@essexwi.org.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window