Accounts and annual returns THE CITY OF LONDON MIGRAINE CLINIC

Charity number: 280294
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2010 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2010 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2009 09 March 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2009 09 March 2010 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2008 26 February 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2008 26 February 2009 On Time
Annual return 01 January 2007 04 December 2007 33 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 January 2007 20 April 2008 171 days late