Accounts and annual returns WALTER INFANT PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 280323
Charity reporting is overdue by 311 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 311 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 311 days
Annual return 31 August 2022 04 July 2023 4 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 04 July 2023 369 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 08 April 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 29 June 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required