WILTSHIRE AMBULANCE SERVICE BENEVOLENT FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide financial assistance (during times of hardships) and holiday accommodation to members and ex-members (including families) of the Wiltshire Ambulance Service Benevolent Fund. Operates within the Wiltshire sector of the South Western Ambulance Service NHS Foundation Trust.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Wiltshire
Governance
- 17 July 1980: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
RYSZARD ORZECHOWSKI | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Andrew Newman | Trustee | 31 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Lorraine Smith | Trustee | 23 July 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £22.81k | £10.44k | £16.93k | £16.36k | £15.26k | |
|
Total expenditure | £15.81k | £13.84k | £13.60k | £18.67k | £19.05k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 10 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 23 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 04 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 11 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 1ST JUNE 1980 AS AMENDED 3 JANUARY 2006.
Charitable objects
TO FURTHER THE EFFICIENCY OF THE WILTSHIRE AMBULANCE SERVICE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY THE RELIEF OF SERVING AND RETIRED MEMBERS WHO ARE IN NECESSITOUS FINANCIAL CIRCUMSTANCES, OR WHO ARE SUFFERING FROM ILL HEALTH OR INJURY, OR THEIR NECESSITOUS WIDOWS, ORPHANS AND DEPENDANTS.
Area of benefit
WILTSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
82 DUNCH LANE
MELKSHAM
SN12 8DX
- Phone:
- 07966534713
- Email:
- charliecopter@msn.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window