The Nixon Foundation

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity has a mission to promote the arts culture and education
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 03 July 1980: Standard registration
- PAUL NORMAN CHARITABLE TRUST (Working name)
- PAUL NORMAN CHARITABLE SETTLEMENT (Previous name)
- SCHOLARSHIPS FOR KIDS (Previous name)
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ROBERT GREGORY THOMPSON | Trustee | 24 January 2025 |
|
|||||
Nicole Sara Kluk | Trustee | 24 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Simon Justin Nixon | Trustee | 24 January 2025 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £530 | £510 | £560 | £1.41k | £630 | |
|
Total expenditure | £510 | £540 | £560 | £1.48k | £690 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 09 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 18 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 19 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 27 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 25 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SETTLEMENT DEED DATED 25TH APRIL 1980 as amended on 24 Jan 2025 as amended on 17 Mar 2025
Charitable objects
TO APPLY THE CAPITAL AND INCOME OF THE TRUST FUND FOR THE BENEFIT OR FURTHERANCE OF SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES CHARITABLE INSTITUTIONS OR CHARITABLE FOUNDATIONS AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Shipgate House
Shipgate Street
Chester
CH1 1RT
- Phone:
- 07793486217
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window