Accounts and annual returns Orchard School Bristol Enrichment Fund

Charity Number: 280424
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2024 06 February 2025 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2024 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2023 09 May 2024 94 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2022 13 February 2023 8 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2021 23 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2020 07 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Not Required