Financial history Orchard School Bristol Enrichment Fund

Charity Number: 280424
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £5.61k £5.76k £5.88k £7.81k £6.87k
Total expenditure £12.00k £0 £5.76k £3.86k £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A