Financial history EDMONDSHAM VILLAGE HALL

Charity Number: 280427
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2020 30/04/2021 30/04/2022 30/04/2023 30/04/2024
Total gross income £13.65k £17.79k £879 £3.04k £4.47k
Total expenditure £4.32k £3.05k £14.66k £7.26k £9.97k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £10.00k £17.43k N/A N/A N/A