TOOLS FOR SELF RELIANCE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our overall mission is to contribute to poverty reduction in Africa by working with partner organisations and our supporters in the UK to empower people to build viable and sustainable livelihoods through the delivery of skills training and through the provision of tools for their trades.We have a network of over 800 UK volunteers who contribute by refurbishing tools.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income:
£758,796
Donations and legacies | £314.64k | |
Charitable activities | £280.96k | |
Other trading activities | £92.18k | |
Investments | £71.02k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£802,492
Raising funds | £162.19k | |
Charitable activities | £640.31k | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £162.19k | |
Charitable expenditure | £640.31k |
People

11 Employee(s)
6 Trustee(s)
400 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Ghana
- Malawi
- Sierra Leone
- Uganda
- Zambia
Governance
- 10 October 1980: Standard registration
- T F S R (Working name)
- TOOLS FOR SELF RELIANCE LTD (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Linda Hansford | Chair | 22 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Samantha Rider | Trustee | 27 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
David Fletcher | Trustee | 21 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Dickins | Trustee | 15 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Pinder | Trustee | 15 October 2022 |
|
|||||
Jacqui Scott | Trustee | 22 September 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.12m | £680.26k | £764.31k | £778.87k | £758.80k | |
|
Total expenditure | £918.60k | £632.64k | £712.33k | £916.13k | £802.49k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £951.96k | £511.03k | £290.14k | £332.08k | £314.64k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £106.36k | £109.01k | £92.03k | £108.91k | £92.18k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | £0 | £319.69k | £274.03k | £280.96k | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £59.03k | £60.22k | £62.46k | £63.85k | £71.02k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £9.11k | £36.96k | £21.45k | £91.15k | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £754.19k | £514.29k | £556.64k | £729.26k | £640.31k | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £164.42k | £118.35k | £155.70k | £186.87k | £162.19k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £7.26k | £5.39k | £5.39k | £5.92k | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £493 | £3.48k | £3.38k | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £142.04k | £137.31k | £145.19k | £137.64k | £130.10k | |
|
Long-term investments | £315.00k | £315.00k | £370.00k | £370.00k | £370.00k | |
|
Other assets | £462.43k | £572.71k | £583.97k | £453.23k | £410.27k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | -£4.42k | -£1.07k | -£580 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £14.31k | £67.82k | £38.32k | £37.79k | £31.57k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 27 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 27 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 24 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 24 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 14 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 14 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 01 December 2020 | 31 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 01 December 2020 | 31 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 26 MAR 1980 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 28 JUN 1980 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 07 JUL 2016
Charitable objects
3 THE OBJECTS FOR WHICH THE COMPANY IS ESTABLISHED ARE: 3.1 THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AMONGST THE PEOPLE IN THE DEVELOPING AREAS IN THE WORLD BY THE PROVISION OF HAND AND OTHER TOOLS AND EQUIPMENT, TOGETHER WITH TRAINING IN THEIR USE, BUSINESS SKILLS AND LIVELIHOOD SKILLS. 3.2 THE COMPANY SHALL HAVE POWER TO DO ANYTHING WHICH IS CALCULATED TO FURTHER ITS OBJECTIVES OR IS CONDUCIVE OR INCIDENTAL TO DOING SO. IN PARTICULAR THE COMPANY HAS THE POWER: 3.2.1 TO ORGANISE THE COLLECTION OF HAND AND OTHER TOOLS AND EQUIPMENT (WHETHER IN THE UNITED KINGDOM OR ELSEWHERE); 3.2.2 TO ORGANISE THE CLEANING, SORTING AND RENOVATION OF SUCH TOOLS AND EQUIPMENT BY VOLUNTEERS; 3.2.3 TO DISPATCH SUCH TOOLS AND EQUIPMENT TO CO-OPERATIVE AND COMMUNAL PROJECTS IN AFRICA AND OTHER UNDER DEVELOPED PARTS OF THE WORLD; 3.2.4 TO RAISE FUNDS. IN DOING SO THE COMPANY MUST NOT UNDERTAKE ANY TAXABLE PERMANENT TRADING ACTIVITY AND MUST COMPLY WITH ANY RELEVANT STATUTORY REGULATIONS; 3.2.5 TO BUY, TAKE ON LEASE OR IN EXCHANGE, HIRE OR OTHERWISE ACQUIRE ANY PROPERTY AND TO MAINTAIN AND EQUIP IT FOR USE; 3.2.6 TO SELL, LEASE OR OTHERWISE DISPOSE OF ALL OR ANY PART OF THE PROPERTY BELONGING TO THE COMPANY. IN EXERCISING THIS POWER THE COMPANY MUST COMPLY AS APPROPRIATE WITH SECTIONS 117 AND 122 OF THE CHARITIES ACT 2011; 3.2.7 TO BORROW MONEY AND TO CHARGE THE WHOLE OR ANY PART OF THE PROPERTY BELONGING TO THE COMPANY AS SECURITY FOR REPAYMENT OF THE MONEY BORROWED OR AS SECURITY FOR A GRANT OR THE DISCHARGE OF AN OBLIGATION. THE COMPANY MUST APPLY AS APPROPRIATE WITH SECTIONS 124-126 OF THE CHARITIES ACT IF IT WISHES TO MORTGAGE LAND; 3.2.8 TO CO-OPERATE WITH OTHER CHARITIES, VOLUNTARY BODIES AND STATUTORY AUTHORITIES AND TO EXCHANGE INFORMATION AND ADVICE WITH THEM; 3.2.9 TO ESTABLISH OR SUPPORT ANY CHARITABLE TRUSTS, ASSOCIATIONS OR INSTITUTIONS FORMED FOR ANY OF THE CHARITABLE PURPOSES INCLUDED IN THE OBJECTS; 3.2.10 TO ACQUIRE, MERGE WITH OR TO ENTER INTO ANY PARTNERSHIP OR JOINT VENTURE ARRANGEMENT WITH ANY OTHER CHARITY; 3.2.11 TO LEND AND ADVANCE MONEY OR GIVE CREDIT ON SUCH TERMS AS MAY BE CONSIDERED EXPEDIENT FOR THE AFORESAID PURPOSES; 3.2.12 TO SET ASIDE INCOME AS A RESERVE AGAINST FUTURE EXPENDITURE BUT ONLY IN ACCORDANCE WITH A WRITTEN POLICY ABOUT RESERVES; 3.2.13 TO APPLY FOR AND OBTAIN ANY LEGISLATIVE, MUNICIPAL OR OTHER ACTS OR AUTHORISATIONS FOR THE PURPOSE OF ENABLING THE COMPANY TO CARRY ANY OF ITS OBJECTS INTO EFFECT OR FOR EFFECTING ANY MODIFICATIONS OF THE COMPANY'S CONSTITUTION, OR FOR ANY OTHER PURPOSE WHICH MAY BE CONSIDERED EXPEDIENT, AND TO OPPOSE ANY PROCEEDINGS OR ACTIONS WHICH MAY BE CONSIDERED CALCULATED DIRECTLY OR INDIRECTLY TO PREJUDICE THE COMPANY'S INTERESTS; 3.2.14 TO PROCURE THE REGISTRATION OR INCORPORATION OF THE COMPANY IN OR UNDER THE LAWS OF ANY PLACE OUTSIDE ENGLAND, AND TO PROCURE ANY ACT OF PARLIAMENT, PROVISIONAL ORDER, ENACTMENT, DECREE OR OTHER LEGISLATIVE OR EXECUTIVE ACT OF ANY GOVERNMENT, STATE, COLONY, PROVINCE, DOMINION, SOVEREIGN OR AUTHORITY SUPREME, MUNICIPAL, LOCAL OR OTHERWISE FOR THE PURPOSE OF ENABLING THE COMPANY TO CARRY ANY OF ITS OBJECTS INTO EFFECT; 3.2.15 TO EMPLOY AND REMUNERATE SUCH STAFF AS ARE NECESSARY FOR CARRYING OUT THE WORK OF THE COMPANY. THE COMPANY MAY EMPLOY OR REMUNERATE A DIRECTOR ONLY TO THE EXTENT THAT IT IS PERMITTED TO DO SO BY ARTICLE 16.4 AND PROVIDE THAT IT COMPLIES WITH THE CONDITIONS IN THAT ARTICLE; 3.2.16 TO: (A) DEPOSIT OR INVEST FUNDS; (B) EMPLOY A PROFESSIONAL FUND MANAGER; AND (C) ARRANGE FOR THE INVESTMENTS OR OTHER PROPERTY OF THE COMPANY TO BE HELD IN THE NAME OF A NOMINEE (D) IN THE SAME MANNER AND SUBJECT TO THE SAME CONDITIONS AS THE TRUSTEES OF A TRUST ARE PERMITTED TO DO BY THE TRUSTEE ACT 2000; 3.2.17 TO PROVIDE INDEMNITY INSURANCE FOR THE DIRECTORS IN ACCORDANCE WITH, AND SUBJECT TO THE CONDITIONS IN, SECTION 189 OF THE CHARITIES ACT 2011; AND 3.2.18 TO PAY ALL EXPENSES OF AND INCIDENTAL TO THE INCORPORATION AND ESTABLISHMENT OF THE COMPANY. 3.3 THE OBJECTS OF THE COMPANY SHALL NOT EXTEND TO THE REGULATION OF RELATIONS BETWEEN WORKERS AND EMPLOYERS OR ORGANISATION OF WORKERS AND ORGANISATIONS OF EMPLOYERS. 3.4 PROVIDED ALSO THAT IN CASE THE COMPANY SHALL TAKE OR HOLD ANY PROPERTY SUBJECT TO THE JURISDICTION OF THE CHARITY COMMISSIONERS FOR ENGLAND AND WALES THE COMPANY SHALL NOT SELL, MORTGAGE, CHARGE OR LEASE THE SAME WITHOUT SUCH AUTHORITY, APPROVAL OR CONSENT AS MAY BE REQUIRED BY LAW, AND AS REGARDS ANY SUCH PROPERTY THE DIRECTORS OR OTHER THE MANAGERS OR TRUSTEES OF THE COMPANY SHALL BE CHARGEABLE FOR SUCH PROPERTY AS MAY COME INTO THEIR HANDS, AND SHALL BE ANSWERABLE AND ACCOUNTABLE FOR THEIR OWN ACTS, RECEIPTS, NEGLECTS AND DEFAULTS AND FOR THE DUE ADMINISTRATION OF SUCH PROPERTY IN THE SAME MANNER AND TO THE SAME EXTENT AS THEY WOULD HAVE BEEN ANSWERABLE AND ACCOUNTABLE AS SUCH DIRECTORS OR OTHER MANAGERS OR TRUSTEES IF NO INCORPORATION HAD BEEN EFFECTED, AND THE INCORPORATION OF THE COMPANY SHALL NOT DIMINISH OR IMPAIR ANY CONTROL OR AUTHORITY EXERCISABLE BY THE CHANCERY DIVISION OF THE HIGH COURT OF JUSTICE, THE CHARITY COMMISSIONERS OVER SUCH DIRECTORS OR OTHER MANAGERS OR TRUSTEES, BUT AS REGARDS ANY SUCH PROPERTY THEY SHALL BE SUBJECT TO SUCH CONTROL OR AUTHORITY AS IF THE COMPANY WERE NOT INCORPORATED. IN CASE THE COMPANY SHALL TAKE OR HOLD ANY PROPERTY WHICH MAY BE SUBJECT TO ANY TRUSTS THE COMPANY SHALL ONLY DEAL WITH THE SAME IN SUCH MANNER AS ALLOWED BY LAW HAVING REGARD TO SUCH TRUSTS.
Area of benefit
OVERSEAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
TOOLS FOR SELF RELIANCE
RINGWOOD ROAD
WOODLANDS
SOUTHAMPTON
SO40 7GY
- Phone:
- 02380869697
- Email:
- info@tfsr.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window