Financial history WHITESHILL AND RUSCOMBE VILLAGE HALL

Charity Number: 280476
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £6.45k £17.63k £13.70k £6.05k £6.54k
Total expenditure £11.24k £8.52k £9.25k £7.11k £9.29k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £10.00k £12.17k N/A N/A