Governing document STOWMARKET CHORALE

Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 07/06/1972 AS AMENDED ON 13/06/1973 AS AMENDED ON 19/06/1974 AS AMENDED ON 20/06/1979 AS AMENDED ON 05/10/2005 AS AMENDED ON 06/10/2010
Charitable objects
TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN THE ARTS AND SCIENCES, AND IN PARTICULAR THE ART AND SCIENCE OF MUSIC, BY THE PRESENTATION OF CONCERTS AND OTHER ACTIVITIES. TO FURTHER SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSE OR PURPOSES AS THE COMMITTEE IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION SHALL THINK FIT BUT IN PARTICULAR THROUGH THE MAKING OF GRANTS AND DONATIONS.
Area of benefit
STOWMARKET
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.