CORNWALL LEISURE ACTIVITIES AND SPORTS PLAYERS
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Carpet Bowls sessions are held at All Saints' Community Centre, Tuckingmill in Camborne on Tuesday and Thursday evenings from 7.00pm. Club members participate in the Camborne & District Carpet Bowls League. Also Swimming sessions are held monthly on the 2nd Sunday, 7.30pm-8.15pm, at Carn Brea Leisure Centre at Pool near Redruth. Social events are occasionally arranged.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2018
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Cornwall
Governance
- 23 July 1980: Standard registration
- 03 September 2020: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- CLASP (Working name)
- CARN BREA LEISURE ACTIVITIES AND SPORTS PLAYERS (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2014 | 31/12/2015 | 31/12/2016 | 31/12/2017 | 31/12/2018 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.34k | £1.70k | £1.73k | £1.61k | £2.10k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.25k | £1.27k | £1.58k | £1.66k | £1.97k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2018 | 27 April 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2018 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2017 | 19 April 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2017 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2016 | 18 May 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2016 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION AND RULES ADOPTED 8TH JUNE 1975 AS AMENDED 6TH MAY 1979, 20 APRIL 1989 AND 22 SEPTEMBER 1996, AS AMENDED 18TH MAY 2003.
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF PERSONS WITH A DISABILITY BY ENCOURAGING AND PROMOTING ACTIVE OR LEISURE-TIME ACTIVITIES AMONG SUCH PERSONS SUITABLE TO THEIR INDIVIDUAL CAPABILITIES AND INCLUDING THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN ORDER THAT THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE SHALL BE IMPROVED
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED (IN PRACTICE CAMBORNE-REDRUTH)
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window