THE DJANOGLY FOUNDATION

Charity number: 280500
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Grants are made to registered charities.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024

Total income: £135,056
Total expenditure: £532,842

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Disability
  • Religious Activities
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Amateur Sport
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
  • Economic/community Development/employment
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • City Of Westminster
  • Nottingham City
  • Nottinghamshire
  • Israel

Governance

Registration history:
  • 17 July 1980: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
JOANNA DJANOGLY Trustee 15 January 2022
THE JOSEPH AND QUEENIE GOLD CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
JONATHAN SIMON DJANOGLY Trustee 07 January 2019
THE JOSEPH AND QUEENIE GOLD CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
SIR HARRY DJANOGLY CBE Trustee
THE JOSEPH AND QUEENIE GOLD CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
MICHAEL SIMON DJANOGLY Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £115.69k £44.50k £45.77k £96.93k £135.06k
Total expenditure £25.76k £13.56k £12.05k £100.48k £532.84k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2024 26 November 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2024 26 November 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2023 19 December 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 19 December 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2022 18 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 18 October 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2021 07 December 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 07 December 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2020 17 November 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 17 November 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
J & Q GOLD CHARITRABLE TRUST
3 ANGEL COURT
LONDON
SW1Y 6QF
Phone:
02079309845
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available