Trustees THE ARTS SOCIETY CHICHESTER
Charity Number: 280506

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Christina Wilks | Trustee | 08 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Pamela Ann Cook | Trustee | 10 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Gillian Walsh | Trustee | 10 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Colin Cook Mr | Trustee | 11 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Marian Carter | Trustee | 02 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
DAVID WILLIAM BASKERVILLE | Trustee | 01 July 2019 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.