ST THOMAS' MELBURY ABBAS PRESERVATION SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Hold fund-raising events in order to be able to finance the preservation of the church.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Dorset
Governance
- 18 August 1980: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JESSICA CRICHTON | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Lavinia Phillips | Trustee | 01 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
MRS NICKY SANDBACH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JULIET HANNAH BICHARD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JOAN PATRICIA RANSOME | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
TAVY BRADLEY WATSON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.10k | £2.24k | £1.91k | £3.80k | £4.95k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.73k | £217 | £2.10k | £5.40k | £2.33k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 19 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 23 April 2024 | 83 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 13 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 15 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 20 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 1ST JULY 1980, AS AMENDED AT AGM ON 30 APRIL 2003, AS AMENDED AT SGM DATED 17TH JULY 2003.
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE SOCIETY IS THE ADVANCEMENT OF RELIGION BY THE RESTORATION AND PRESERVATION OF ST THOMAS' CHURC MELBURY ABBAS.
Area of benefit
MELBURY ABBAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
MELBURY ABBAS MILL
REDMANS LANE
MELBURY ABBAS
SHAFTESBURY
SP7 0DB
- Phone:
- 01747851836
- Email:
- juliet.bichard@hotmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window