THE CYCLAMEN SOCIETY
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Cyclamen Society exists to encourage cultivation and conservation, and to disseminate and extend knowledge of the genus Cyclamen and its species, forms and cultivars. It combines scientific study with all the activities of a society for enthusiasts who cultivate the plants. The Society was formed in England in January 1977 and now has about 1000 members.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2016
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
- Georgia
- Greece
- Japan
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 10 September 1980: Standard registration
- 18 January 2018: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2012 | 30/06/2013 | 30/06/2014 | 30/06/2015 | 30/06/2016 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £26.44k | £30.26k | £33.18k | £27.47k | £26.66k | |
|
Total expenditure | £26.16k | £40.56k | £30.09k | £41.46k | £25.37k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2016 | 31 March 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2016 | 31 March 2017 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 June 2015 | 10 April 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2015 | 10 April 2016 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 June 2014 | 13 April 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2014 | 13 April 2015 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES ADOPTED 29TH JANUARY 1977 AS AMENDED 21ST FEBRUARY 1980, 8TH FEBRUARY 1983, 29TH SEPTEMBER 1991, 25TH SEPTEMBER 1994, 4TH OCTOBER 1998 AND 21ST SEPTEMBER 2008
Charitable objects
TO ENCOURAGE THE CULTIVATION, AND CONSERVATION, AND TO DISSEMINATE KNOWLEDGE OF THE GENUS CYCLAMEN AND ITS SPECIES FORMS AND CULTIVARS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window