SEWING MACHINE TRADE BENEVOLENT FUND
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Gifts to needy members & ex members of the sewing trade association
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2007
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Charitable Purposes
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 20 March 1984: Standard registration
- 09 October 2010: Removed (Does not operate)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2006 | 05/04/2007 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £240 | £282 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2010 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2010 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2007 | 14 August 2007 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2007 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2006 | 13 October 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2006 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 12TH JUNE 1980
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF NECESSITOUS PERSONS WHO ARE OR HAVE BEEN MEMBERS OF THE SEWING MACHINE TRADE ASSOCIATION, PARTNERS OR EMPLOYEES OF SUCH MEMBERS) DIRECTORS OR EMPLOYEES OF CORPORATE MEMBERS OF THE S.M.T.A. EMPLOYEES OF THE S.M.T.A.; WIVES WIDOWS WIDOWERS CHILDREN OR DEPENDANTS OF ANY OF THE ABOVE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window