RAYNE WOMEN'S INSTITUTE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Women's Institute
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Human Resources
- Essex
Governance
- 28 July 1980: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
KATHLEEN RAVEN | Chair | 03 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
Dawn Hicks | Trustee | 01 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Andrea Stanley | Trustee | 01 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Gail Reynolds | Trustee | 01 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
SANDRA BAKER | Trustee | 03 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
Jan Moller | Trustee | 03 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
Charlotte Brine | Trustee | 03 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
MAUREEN RICHARDSON | Trustee | 03 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
ALISON DOYLE | Trustee | 01 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
BEVERLEY HEDGES | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.90k | £1.81k | £3.40k | £4.49k | £5.48k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.46k | £2.17k | £3.00k | £4.07k | £4.46k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 17 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 25 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 09 January 2024 | 70 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 19 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 04 January 2022 | 65 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MODEL CONSTITUTION AND RULES (ALREADY LODGED)
Charitable objects
TO IMPROVE AND DEVELOP CONDITIONS OF RURAL LIFE AND TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF COUNTRYWOMEN IN CITIZENSHIP, IN PUBLIC QUESTIONS BOTH NATIONAL AND INTERNATIONAL, IN MUSIC, DRAMA AND OTHER CULTURAL SUBJECTS, ALSO TO SECURE INSTRUCTION AND TRAINING IN ALL BRANCHES OF AGRICULTURE, HANDICRAFTS, DOMESTIC SCIENCE, HEALTH AND SOCIAL WELFARE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
7 Faggot Yard
Church Lane
Braintree
CM7 5SJ
- Phone:
- 01376348024
- Email:
- cob.cottage@btinternet.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window