THE BATES CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 280602
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The trustees have maintained a programme of support for: (1) Christian relief organisations, overseas mission agencies and projects; (2) Schemes for relief of poverty and sources of poverty within the Midlands; (3) Support for local church mission projects, primarily within Derbyshire.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024

Total income: £36,302
Total expenditure: £47,999

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Overseas Aid/famine Relief
  • Accommodation/housing
  • Religious Activities
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Derby City
  • Derbyshire
  • Leicester City
  • Leicestershire
  • Lincolnshire
  • Nottingham City
  • Nottinghamshire
  • Staffordshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 20 May 1980: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev William Frederic Bates Chair
None on record
MRS N WALDRON Trustee
None on record
JOY ELIZABETH BATES Trustee
Chaplaincy Derbyshire
Received: On time
JOHN HAYWARD BATES Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £36.94k £32.24k £32.75k £34.58k £36.30k
Total expenditure £49.30k £33.70k £33.74k £34.85k £48.00k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2024 17 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2024 17 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2023 30 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 30 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2022 24 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 24 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2021 07 February 2022 2 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 07 February 2022 2 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2020 29 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 29 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
20 Main Avenue
Allestree
Derby
DE22 2EG
Phone:
01332603605
Website:

No information available