Governing document BRIGHAM YOUNG UNIVERSITY LIMITED
Charity number: 280605

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 16/05/1980 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 27/10/2005 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 14/11/2005 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 17/07/2012 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 23/08/2012
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE AND FURTHER THE EDUCATIONAL AND OTHER CHARITABLE WORK OF BRIGHAM YOUNG UNIVERSITY IN THE UNITED KINGDOM OR ELSEWHERE.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.