Financial history THE FRANCIS BACON RESEARCH TRUST

Charity number: 280616
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £76.28k £41.00k £18.91k £21.85k £50.61k
Total expenditure £64.96k £24.70k £28.14k £28.43k £52.73k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A