INDIAN QUEENS PIT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
PROTECT AND MAINTAIN THE OLD METHODIST PREACHING PIT/AMPHITHEATER, (BEING A SCHEDULED MONUMENT), AND IT'S ASSOCIATED COMMUNITY HALL FOR VIEWING AND USE BY THE GENERAL PUBLIC, THE LATTER BEING FOR HIRE TO ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FUNDS FOR FUTURE MAINTENANCE. ADDITIONAL FUND RAISING WILL ALSO BE UNDERTAKEN TO ENSURE THE CONTINUED SUSTAINABILITY AND PROMOTION AS AN EDUCATIONAL SITE.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Cornwall
Governance
- 08 February 1982: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PAMELA ROSE OULD | Trustee | 07 June 2011 |
|
|||||
REGINALD MALCOLM WILLIAMS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
RICHARD MICHAEL COLE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JEFFREY MICHAEL PARSONS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.32k | £2.03k | £272 | £9.29k | £8.34k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.82k | £2.83k | £1.36k | £8.99k | £11.40k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 21 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 11 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 01 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 12 September 2021 | 44 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 12 February 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONVEYANCE DATED 10TH JANUARY 1921 SCHEME OF 20TH FEBRUARY 1981 as amended on 28 Jan 2022
Charitable objects
THE TRUSTEES SHALL APPLY THE RENT RESERVED UNDER THE LEASE FOR FURTHERING THE RELIGION AND OTHER CHARITABLE WORK OF THE METHODIST CHURCH IN INDIAN QUEEN AND FRADDON
Area of benefit
INDIAN QUEEN AND FRADDON AND DISTRICT
Contact information
- Address:
-
5 Pocohontas Crescent
Indian Queens
ST. COLUMB
Cornwall
TR9 6RA
- Phone:
- 01726861815
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window