SPACE COUNSELLING SERVICE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Based in Slough, SPACE specialises in Mental Health. We provide counselling and support services to a wide range of people experiencing emotional and psychological problems as a result, for example, of trauma, abuse, bereavement, relationship difficulties and domestic violence. Services include one-to-one counselling, facilitating support groups and counselling training for community projects.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2009
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Buckinghamshire
- Slough
Governance
- 18 August 1980: Standard registration
- 25 January 2012: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- SPACE (Working name)
- SLOUGH PROJECT FOR ADVICE COUNSELLING AND EDUCATION (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2005 | 31/03/2006 | 31/03/2007 | 31/03/2008 | 31/03/2009 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £79.28k | £106.34k | £113.76k | £144.76k | £172.09k | |
|
Total expenditure | £91.22k | £91.68k | £103.75k | £117.13k | £164.60k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2010 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2010 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2009 | 11 February 2010 | 11 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2009 | 22 December 2009 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2008 | 26 November 2008 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2008 | 14 January 2009 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION AND RULES ADOPTED 14TH JULY 1980 AS AMENDED 30 SEPTEMBER 2002
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECT IS TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT THE HEALTH BOTH PHYSICAL AND MENTAL OF PERSONS RESIDENT IN SLOUGH AND THE SURROUNDING AREA WITH A PREFERENCE FOR YOUNG PERSONS UNDER 25, IN PARTICULAR BY PROVIDING LOW-COST OR FREE COUNSELLING TO PEOPLE WITH EMOTIONAL, PSYCHOLOGICAL AND RELATIONSHIP PROBLEMS.
Area of benefit
SLOUGH AND SURROUNDING AREA
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window