THE SUFFOLK HERALDRY SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity helps restore Coats of Arms in the churches in Suffolk. We also hold exhibitions to enable members of the public understand why and how Coats of Arms are used in connection with families history etc. Taking this into schools enabling children to learn about heraldry. Also we are recording Coats of Arms on buildings.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Suffolk
Governance
- 21 August 1980: Standard registration
No other names
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JOHN JAMES TUNESI OF LIONGAM | Trustee | 24 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
DAWN BERNADETTE SCOTCHER | Trustee | 17 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
PATRICK GILBERT DOMINICK TORIGLIONI DEL CASSERO-NISBETT | Trustee | 17 October 2024 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £862 | £744 | £20 | £724 | £365 | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.08k | £424 | £897 | £1.28k | £934 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 26 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 01 December 2024 | 215 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 10 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 25 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 07 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 27TH SEPTEMBER 1979 AS AMENDED 2ND OCTOBER 1980, AND 24TH OCTOBER 1987
Charitable objects
TO ENCOURAGE THE STUDY AND PRACTICE OF HERALDRY AND ALLIED SUBJECTS, WITH PARTICULAR REFERENCE TO SUFFOLK, BY PROVIDING A PROGRAMME OF LECTURES AND DISCUSSION MEETINGS, BY ARRANGING VISITS TO PLACES OF HERALDIC OR HISTORIC INTEREST AND BY SUCH OTHER MEANS AS THE COMMITTEE SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME SEE FIT. \THE SOCIETY SHALL ALSO SUPPORT THE AIMS OF THE HERALDRY SOCIETY.
Area of benefit
COUNTY OF SUFFOLK
Contact information
- Address:
-
97 HUMBER DOUCY LANE
IPSWICH
IP4 3NU
- Phone:
- 01473726396
- Email:
- donandlucia@yahoo.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window