THE LONDON TRUST FOR TRINITY COLLEGE DUBLIN

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote the advancement of education generally and in particular public access to education facilities and of higher education in the British Isles and at Trinity College Dublin.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
- Ireland
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 25 July 1980: Standard registration
- THE UNITED KINGDOM TRUST FOR TRINITY COLLEGE DUBLIN (Working name)
- THE LONDON TRUST FOR TRINITY COLLEGE DUBLIN (Previous name)
- TRINITY COLLEGE, DUBLIN (UNIVERSITY OF DUBLIN) TRUST (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
RUPERT LASCELLES PENNANT-REA | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
LADY EVIE DUFF GORDON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
FRANK LARKIN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £125.32k | £316.46k | £303.91k | £635.74k | £421.54k | |
|
Total expenditure | £94.12k | £333.42k | £293.23k | £610.54k | £457.60k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | £632.50k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | £3.24k | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | £286.08k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £610.54k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | N/A | £3.24k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | N/A | £607.30k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 22 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 22 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 24 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 24 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 24 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 24 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 15 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 15 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2019 | 17 April 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2019 | 17 April 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 9TH JULY 1980
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND IN PARTICULAR HIGHER EDUCATION AT TRINITY COLLEGE, DUBLIN.
Area of benefit
DUBLIN
Contact information
- Address:
-
C/O Simmons Gainford Services Ltd
33 Cavendish Square
LONDON
W1G 0PW
- Phone:
- 0035318964719
- Email:
- ivanovd@tcd.ie
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window