Financial history BRENT COMMUNITY TRANSPORT

Charity number: 280698
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £872.62k £859.73k £707.44k £724.64k £1.02m
Total expenditure £1.06m £927.45k £818.74k £790.09k £1.01m
Income from government contracts £509.37k N/A N/A £563.00k £716.44k
Income from government grants £11.14k £11.14k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £650 £226.83k £31.85k £2.70k £3.00k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £871.93k £632.88k £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £39 £10 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other £0 £0 £100.75k £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.06m £927.45k £818.74k £0 £0
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £0 £5.10k £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £790.09k £1.01m