DOMINICA DEVELOPMENT ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 280704
Removed charity

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

(A) The relief of poverty and distress caused by hurricane David either by payment to individuals in necessitous circumstances or by contributions to approved charitable organisations already existing for that purpose. (B) The advancement of education by contributing to charitable institutions or funds for advancement of educational facilities as may be approved by the association.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2009

Total income: £465
Total expenditure: £230

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Overseas Aid/famine Relief
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
Who the charity helps:
  • People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 10 September 1980: Standard registration
  • 19 August 2009: Removed (Does not operate)
  • 08 January 2010: Standard registration
  • 09 September 2011: Removed (Does not operate)
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
No information available

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2004 31/03/2007 31/03/2008 31/03/2009
Total gross income £1.24k £550 £320 £465
Total expenditure £1.90k £362 £180 £230
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2011 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2011 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2010 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2010 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2009 08 January 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2009 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2008 23 December 2009 326 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2008 Not Required