Financial history UMBERLEIGH VILLAGE HALL

Charity Number: 280712
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/01/2020 31/01/2021 31/01/2022 31/01/2023 31/01/2024
Total gross income £7.40k £23.37k £20.65k £11.05k £8.81k
Total expenditure £7.83k £15.47k £21.86k £7.22k £11.73k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £21.46k £16.34k £2.67k N/A