NATIONAL COUNCIL OF HINDU TEMPLES (UK)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Hindu Community activities and helping our Hindu temples members, liaison and coordination with other Hindu organisations in the UK
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 21 August 1980: Standard registration
- 23 September 2009: Removed (Does not operate)
- 16 August 2011: Re-registered
- NCHT (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ARUN THAKUR | Chair | 29 December 2019 |
|
|||||
JIWAN KUMAR KENTH SECRETARY | Trustee | 29 December 2019 |
|
|||||
JAI DUTT SHARMA - GENERAL SECRETARY | Trustee | 29 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
MANGHAT RAI SHARMA - VICE PRESIDENT | Trustee | 29 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
NARINDER KUMAR KALIA TRUSTEE | Trustee | 29 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
MAHESH C PRASHER - TRUSTEE | Trustee | 11 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
MR KULWANT RAI GAUTAM | Trustee | 28 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
MR RASHMIKANT JOSHI | Trustee | 02 July 2013 |
|
|||||
MR JASHWANT CHAUHAN | Trustee | 30 April 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.34k | £874 | £410 | £378 | £235 | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.98k | £2.15k | £340 | £4.87k | £441 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 15 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 02 March 2023 | 30 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 01 February 2022 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 07 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 23RD MARCH 1980 AS AMENDED 26TH JUNE 1988
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF HINDU RELIGION AND TO RELIEVE POVERTY AMONGST HINDUS RESIDENT IN THE UNITED KINGDOM.
Area of benefit
UNITED KINGDOM
Contact information
- Address:
-
NCHTUK - PRESIDENT
C/O SHREE RAM MANDIR
22 KING STREET
SOUTHALL
UB2 4DA
- Phone:
- 07548287276
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window