TRUST TO PRESERVE THE HISTORY OF 6TH AIRBORNE DIVISION'S ASSAULT INTO NORMANDY
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Preservation of sites in Normandy relevant to the history of the ^th Airborne Division.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2014
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 21 November 1980: Standard registration
- 20 January 2016: Removed (Transfer of funds)
- 20 January 2016: Funds transferred to 1131977 THE PARACHUTE REGIMENT AND AIRBORNE FORCES CHARITY
- AIRBORNE ASSAULT NORMANDY TRUST (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2010 | 31/12/2011 | 31/12/2012 | 31/12/2013 | 31/12/2014 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.82k | £3.29k | £7.25k | £8.57k | £2.50k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.28k | £3.81k | £1.62k | £6.05k | £4.71k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2014 | 02 April 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2014 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2013 | 06 March 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2013 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2012 | 06 February 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2012 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 17TH OCTOBER 1980
Charitable objects
(A) THE PERMANENT PRESERVATION OF THE NORMANDY SITE FOR THE EDUCATION AND BENEFIT OF THE NATION AND THE ARMED FORCES OF THE UNITED KINGDOM AND PERSONS LIKELY TO ENLIST THEREIN. (B) SUCH OTHER TRUSTS OR PURPOSES (INCLUDING WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY THEREOF THE RELIEF OF NEED AMONGST MEMBERS DEPENDENTS AND FAMILIES OF BRITISH SERVICEMEN AND SERVICE CHARITIES GENERALLY) RECOGNISED BY THE LAWS OF ENGLAND TO BE CHARITABLE AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL, IN THEIR UNCONTROLLED DISCRETION FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE. (FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE CLAUSE 3 OF THE TRUST DEED.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window