THE DEVON HORSE AND PONY SANCTUARY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Devon Horse and Pony Sanctuary is dedicated to the care, of equines in need. We provide a loving home for equines to the end of their days and in appropriate cases will find the right loan home for the right animal. We also provide a permanent home for retired Police horses and other working equines. We will also take in emergency neglect cases and provide the appropriate care.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Devon
- France
Governance
- 25 September 1980: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ROLAND EDWARD PHILLIPS | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Louise Henwood | Trustee | 19 December 2016 |
|
|
||||
Dr Alison Julie Stokes | Trustee | 03 November 2013 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £273.41k | £127.94k | £55.50k | £159.18k | £179.52k | |
|
Total expenditure | £120.72k | £140.25k | £79.55k | £98.97k | £166.12k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 29 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 29 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 25 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 25 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 30 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 30 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 30 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 30 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 30 June 2021 | 61 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 30 June 2021 | 61 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 1ST JULY 1980 AS AMENDED 03 APRIL 2010
Charitable objects
(A) TO EXPOSE, PREVENT AND RELIEVE CRUELTY TO HORSES AND PONIES (WHICH EXPRESSION SHALL HEREIN INCLUDE DONKEYS AND MULES) AND TO PROTECT THEM FROM UNNECESSARY SUFFERING AND FOR THAT PURPOSE TO PROMOTE KNOWLEDGE OF THEIR PROPER CARE AND TREATMENT AMONG THE PUBLIC (B) TO RELIEVE PAIN AND SUFFERING IN HORSES OR PONIES WHICH ARE FOR ANY REASON PERMANENTLY OR TEMPORARILY UNFIT FOR WORK OR IN NEED OF CARE BY THE PROVISION, MAINTENANCE AND MANAGEMENT OF A SANCTUARY OR SANCTUARIES, STABLING OR GRAZING OR BY THE PROVISION OF SUITABLE WORK SITUATIONS UNDER THE SUPERVISION OF THE SANCTUARY OR BY ARRANG-ING FOR THEIR PAINLESS DESTRUCTION OR BY ANY COMBINATION OF SUCH MEANS AS AFORESAID. (C) TO PROVIDE FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OHER LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR THE BENEFIT OF PHYSICALLY HANDICAPPED CHILDREN AND MENTALLY HANDICAPPED CHILDREN HAVING NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, INFIRMITY AND DISABLEMENT WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITION OF LIFE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE OLD BARN
SOUTHCOTT
MANATON
NEWTON ABBOT
DEVON
TQ13 9UW
- Phone:
- 01647221209
- Email:
- ROLANDPHILLIPS@HOTMAIL.CO.UK
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window