THE FIRST FRUITS TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2004
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 07 August 1980: Standard registration
- 02 September 2009: Removed (Does not operate)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2004 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £540 | |
|
Total expenditure | £400 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2005 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2005 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 5TH JUNE 1980
Charitable objects
SUCH CHARITABLE INSTITUTION OR INSTITUTIONS PURPOSE OR PURPOSES IN SUCH SHARES BETWEEN THEM IF MORE THAN ONE AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window