TRUST PROPERTY HELD IN CONNECTION WITH SYCAMORE CHAPEL (INDEPENDENT EVANGELICAL CHURCH)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Local church meeting the needs of the local and surrounding community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Gloucestershire
- Herefordshire
- Worcestershire
Governance
- 22 September 1980: Standard registration
- Northway Sycamore Chapel (Working name)
- Nothway Sycamore Chapel (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Dr Nigel Scotland | Trustee | 07 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rev Dan Browne | Trustee | 15 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Tim Browne | Trustee | 15 July 2021 |
|
|||||
JEFF BROWN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £17.96k | £9.28k | £13.76k | £47.20k | £56.92k | |
|
Total expenditure | £33.61k | £14.08k | £5.10k | £48.97k | £56.96k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 13 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 13 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 24 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 24 August 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 11 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 06 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 30 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED DATED 10TH NOVEMBER 1978
Charitable objects
FOR SUCH RELIGIOUS OR OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES IN CONNECTION WITH SYCAMORE CHAPEL INCLUDING THEIR USE AS A RESIDENCE FOR A PASTOR OF THE CHURCH AS THE CHURCH SHALL BY RESOLUTION FORM TIME TO TIME DIRECT.
Area of benefit
TEWKSBURY
Contact information
- Address:
-
11 Haslette Way
Up Hatherley
CHELTENHAM
Gloucestershire
GL51 3RQ
- Phone:
- 07581 176083
- Email:
- timbrowne@blueyonder.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window