THE BEACON TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Trust continues in being active in Christian agencies working in the developing world, being engaged in work as widely varied as transport, emergency relief aid, education and the support of expatriate staff involved in long term mission and development
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Charitable Activities
- Cornwall
- Surrey
- Nepal
Governance
- 22 October 1980: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kirsty Hawker | Trustee | 24 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
FIONA RUTH HAWKER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
STEPHEN RICHARD HAWKER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ANTONY VICTOR HAWKER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MRS LESLEY BERYL HAWKER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DAVID BERNARD GEORGE HAWKER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £22.20k | £17.92k | £14.80k | £15.39k | £15.95k | |
|
Total expenditure | £16.99k | £16.18k | £14.39k | £18.89k | £16.14k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 21 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 21 June 2024 | 52 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 11 May 2023 | 11 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 01 May 2022 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 23 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 24TH JULY 1980
Charitable objects
I. THE FURTHERANCE OF RELIGION OR SECULAR EDUCATION. II. THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH EITHER IN THE UNITED KINGDOM OR OVERSEAS. III. THE ENCOURAGEMENT OF MISSIONARY ACTIVITY DESIGNED FOR THE SPREAD OF SUCH CHRISTIAN FAITH. IV. THE RELIEF OF THE POOR AND NEEDY. V. THE HELP AND COMFORT OF THE SICK AND AGED. VI. GENERALLY THE ADVANCEMENT OF ANY RELIGIOUS OR OTHER CHARITABLE OBJECT NOT INCONSISTENT WITH THE FOREGOING.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE HOLT
ALCOCKS LANE
KINGSWOOD
TADWORTH
KT20 6BB
- Phone:
- 02086558500
- Email:
- ANTONY.HAWKER@ECIT.UK
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window