CORBY VILLAGE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Disable group, religious group, martial arts, bingo, training courses, coffee morning, weddings and funerals, Grampian travel section, quiz nights & dancing, residents meetings, Eastern Star, Muslim group, Bible studies, social events & birthday parties, Martial Arts, Healthy Habits Group,Integrated cancer therapy.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 28 February 2015
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Northamptonshire
Governance
- 03 September 1980: Standard registration
- 15 August 2016: Removed (Transfer of funds)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 28/02/2011 | 28/02/2012 | 28/02/2013 | 28/02/2014 | 28/02/2015 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £19.19k | £23.99k | £19.79k | £14.69k | £17.90k | |
|
Total expenditure | £24.64k | £20.22k | £15.66k | £16.59k | £19.71k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 28 February 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2015 | 26 January 2016 | 29 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2015 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2014 | 24 September 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2014 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2013 | 11 November 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2013 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 9TH JULY 1980 AS AMENDED ON 30/03/2010
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF CORBY VILLAGE AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD BOUNDED BY NO 54 COTTINGHAM ROAD, THE RAILWAY BRIDGES ON OAKLEY ROAD,GEDDINGTON ROAD AND WELDON ROAD WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX OR OF POLITICAL RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS AND INHABITANTS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
CORBY
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window