1ST OLNEY SCOUT GROUP

Charity Number: 280890
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

1st Olney Scout Group. (Including Beavers, Scouts & Cubs)

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £16,042
Total expenditure: £15,826

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Religious Activities
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
  • Economic/community Development/employment
  • Recreation
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
Where the charity operates:
  • Buckinghamshire
  • Milton Keynes
  • Northamptonshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 22 October 1980: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Helena Brookes Trustee 25 July 2024
None on record
Gillian Margaret Morris Trustee 21 July 2024
None on record
Tim Jones Trustee 10 February 2024
None on record
Dr ROGER STEVEN HULL PHD ACA Trustee 10 June 2014
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £8.13k £2.71k £5.01k £13.67k £16.04k
Total expenditure £8.18k £5.63k £8.26k £13.01k £15.83k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 18 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 30 December 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 14 November 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 30 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 13 December 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
30 Castle Road
Lavendon
OLNEY
Buckinghamshire
MK46 4JE
Phone:
01234713143
Website:

No information available